Goins v. GEO Lawton Correctional Facility et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Christian Goins
Defendant: GEO Lawton Correctional Facility, Michael Boyer and Mark Bowen
Case Number: 5:2022cv01014
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Jodi W Dishman
Referring Judge: Gary M Purcell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Filing 9 Receipt for Money Received from Jacob Christian Goins in the amount of $9.80, receipt number 500000679 regarding #1 Complaint. Balance remaining $340.20. Receipt mailed to Jacob Christian Goins #699137 HOLDENVILLE-DCF 6888 E 133rd Rd Holdenville, OK 74848-9033 (naa)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff shall be required to pay the full $350 filing fee as set forth. See Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 1/17/2023. (cps)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER declining the #5 Report and Recommendation and returns this matter to Judge Purcell with instructions to consider Mr. Goins' application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and to take such further action in this case as is necessary and consistent with the Court's referral under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 01/13/2023. (nv)
January 13, 2023 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (nv)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jacob Christian Goins. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Inmate Account Summary, #2 Attachment 2 - Order to Cure Defieciency, Doc 4, #3 Envelope)(cps)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Jacob Christian Goins. It is recommended Plaintiff's action be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 1/11/2023. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the Magistrate Judge, and any pending motion not specifically addressed herein is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/22/22. (lb)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO CURE DEFICIENCY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above by the 19th day of December, 2022. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to the Plaintiff along with this Order copies of the court-approved in forma pauperis form. Otherwise, the Court will recommend dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 12/1/2022. (cps)
November 30, 2022 Filing 3 ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 11/30/22. (rr)
November 30, 2022 Filing 2 NO PREVIOUS Cases (rr)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Boyer, GEO Lawton Correctional Facility filed by Jacob Christian Goins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. GEO Lawton Correctional Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Christian Goins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEO Lawton Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?