Smoot et al v. TJ Inspection Inc
Plaintiff: William Smoot
Defendant: TJ Inspection Inc
Case Number: 5:2023cv00113
Filed: February 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: This action is administratively terminated without prejudice to the rights of the parties to reopen for entry of any stipulation or order. If not reopened within 45 days to obtain final determination, action is deemed dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 6/1/2023. (ks)
May 3, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE (other) by William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ) of Consent of Alan Ivie (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Josephson, Michael)
April 21, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE (other) by William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ) of Consent for Mehran Shafiei (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Josephson, Michael)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENTER ORDER - On April 5, 2023, the Court held a status conference in this case and set the following deadlines: (1) Motions to amend pleadings to be filed within 30 days from the date of this order; (2) Plaintiffs' motion and supporting brief regarding class certification to be filed by June 9, 2023; (3) Defendant's response brief to be filed by June 30, 2023; and (4) Plaintiffs' reply brief, if any, to be filed by July 7, 2023. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 4/6/2023. (ks)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone for Status and Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 4/3/2023. (ks)
April 3, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone for Status and Scheduling Conference by William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ). (Burch, Richard)
April 3, 2023 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard M Schreiber on behalf of William Smoot(Individually) (Schreiber, Richard)
April 3, 2023 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter Justin Stuhldreher on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (Stuhldreher, Peter)
April 3, 2023 Filing 22 ENTRY of Appearance by Paul Michael Knettel on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (Knettel, Paul)
April 3, 2023 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark D. Temple on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (Temple, Mark)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear by Telephone for Status and Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 4/3/2023. (ks)
April 3, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone for Status and Scheduling Conference by TJ Inspection Inc. (Pittman, Ryan)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting the parties' joint motion for entry of an agreed protective order as requested in the parties' Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan (as more fully set out in order). Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 3/31/2023. (ks)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 , #13 and #14 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Mark D. Temple, Paul M. Knettel and Peter J. Stuhldreher are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Defendant, provided each counsel becomes properly registered and files an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 3/30/2023. (ks)
March 29, 2023 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Defendant TJ Inspection Inc. (Pittman, Ryan)
March 28, 2023 Filing 15 Receipt for Money Received from TJ Inspection Inc in the amount of $150, receipt number 500001450 regarding #14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Stuhldreher, #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Temple, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul M. Knettel (dtb)
March 22, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Peter J. Stuhldreher by TJ Inspection Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Pittman, Ryan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Paul M. Knettel by TJ Inspection Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Pittman, Ryan)
March 22, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark D. Temple by TJ Inspection Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Request for Admission)(Pittman, Ryan)
March 16, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE (other) by William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ) of Filing Notice of Consent (Josephson, Michael)
March 13, 2023 Filing 10 APRIL STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 4/5/2023 10:50 AM in Chambers before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Status Report due by 3/29/2023. (ks)
February 28, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Pittman on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (Pittman, Ryan)
February 28, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TJ Inspection Inc . (Pittman, Ryan)
February 28, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by TJ Inspection Inc.(Pittman, Ryan)
February 14, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Smoot(Individually). TJ Inspection Inc served on 2/7/2023. (Josephson, Michael)
February 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE (other) by William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ) of Filing Notice of Consent (Josephson, Michael)
February 2, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew W Dunlap on behalf of William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ) (Dunlap, Andrew)
February 2, 2023 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Josephson on behalf of William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ), William Smoot(Individually) (Josephson, Michael)
February 2, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to TY Inspection Inc. (cps)
February 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TY Inspection Inc filed by William Smoot(Individually), William Smoot(For Others Similiarly Situated ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Smoot Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cps)
February 2, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4082687. (Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smoot et al v. TJ Inspection Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smoot
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Andrew W Dunlap
Represented By: Richard M Schreiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Inspection Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Pittman
Represented By: Mark D. Temple
Represented By: Paul Michael Knettel
Represented By: Peter Justin Stuhldreher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?