Cox et al v. TJ Inspection Inc
Plaintiff: Shawn Cox
Defendant: TJ Inspection Inc
Case Number: 5:2023cv00187
Filed: February 24, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Charles Goodwin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2023 Filing 38 REPLY by Plaintiffs Shawn Cox, Shawn Cox re #35 MOTION to Certify Class (FLSA Notice) Or Alternatively, Amend Complaint filed by Shawn Cox(individually), Shawn Cox(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Am. Notice Docs)(Moulton, David)
July 19, 2023 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Certify Class (FLSA Notice) Or Alternatively, Amend Complaint filed by TJ Inspection Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McMahon, Cathleen)
June 27, 2023 Filing 36 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Shawn Cox, Shawn Cox Re: #35 MOTION to Certify Class (FLSA Notice) Or Alternatively, Amend Complaint (Moulton, David)
June 27, 2023 Filing 35 MOTION to Certify Class (FLSA Notice) Or Alternatively, Amend Complaint by Shawn Cox(individually), Shawn Cox(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, Wickson Decl., #2 Exhibit 3, Vacha Decl., #3 Exhibit 4, Cox Decl., #4 Exhibit 5, Tome Decl., #5 Exhibit 6, Notice Docs, #6 Exhibit 7, Am Complaint, #7 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Moulton, David)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. Plaintiff shall submit, within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this Order, a written motion for conditional notice stage certification of the proposed class of similarly situated persons. The motion shall include a proposed form of notice to employees and a proposed notice and opt-in schedule. Plaintiff's motion also shall state whether Defendant agrees or objects to the relief sought. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 06/13/2023. (jb)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to join due within 14 days; Motions to amend due within 14 days; Pla expert witness list and expert reports due 12/20/2023; Dft expert witness list and expert reports due 21 days thereafter; Pla witness list due 01/04/2024; Dft witness list due 14 days thereafter; Pla exhibit list due 01/04/2024; Dft exhibit list due 14 days thereafter; Motions in limine due 04/15/2024; Jury instructions due 04/15/2024; Voir dire requests due 04/15/2024; Discovery due by 3/1/2024. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 305 before Judge Charles Goodwin. Motions due by 2/1/2024. Pretrial Report due by 4/15/2024. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 06/13/2023. (jb)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 06/07/2023. (jb)
May 9, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE (other) by Shawn Cox(individually), Shawn Cox(on behalf of all others similarly situated) of Filing Consent (Moulton, David)
May 3, 2023 Filing 30 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2023 10:20 AM telephonically before Judge Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 5/31/2023. (jb)
April 26, 2023 Filing 29 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN by Plaintiffs Shawn Cox, Shawn Cox. (Moulton, David)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #25 MOTION to Continue Status and Scheduling Conference filed by TJ Inspection Inc. The current conference setting is STRICKEN, to be reset by further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 04/26/2023. (jb)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 04/26/2023. (jb)
April 25, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE (other) by Shawn Cox(individually), Shawn Cox(on behalf of all others similarly situated) of Filing Consent (Moulton, David)
April 25, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Continue Status and Scheduling Conference by TJ Inspection Inc. (McMahon, Cathleen)
April 21, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Order Excusing Local Counsel Requirement by TJ Inspection Inc. (McMahon, Cathleen)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Ryan A Pittman and Christopher S Thrutchley terminated. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 04/14/2023. (jb)
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. Attorneys McMahon and Bragalone shall, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, either show association with local counsel or file a motion seeking to be excused from the local-counsel requirement. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 04/14/2023. (jb)
April 13, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney / Withdrawal of Ryan Pittman, Mark Temple, Peter Stuhldreher, Paul Knettel, Christopher Thrutchley by TJ Inspection Inc. (Attachments: #1 Attachment proposed Order)(Pittman, Ryan)
April 13, 2023 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Cathleen W McMahon on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (McMahon, Cathleen)
April 13, 2023 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A Bragalone on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (Bragalone, Robert)
April 10, 2023 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard J Burch on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burch, Richard)
April 7, 2023 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by David I Moulton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moulton, David)
April 6, 2023 Filing 16 DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/3/2023 11:40 AM telephonically before Judge Charles Goodwin. Status Report due by 4/26/2023. (jb)
April 3, 2023 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher S Thrutchley on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (Thrutchley, Christopher)
March 31, 2023 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Ryan A Pittman on behalf of TJ Inspection Inc (Pittman, Ryan)
March 30, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by TJ Inspection Inc . (Pittman, Ryan)
March 30, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by TJ Inspection Inc.(Pittman, Ryan)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave. On or before April 12, 2023, Attorney Burch shall electronically file an entry of appearance on the form prescribed by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 03/29/2023. (jb)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. On or before April 12, 2023, Attorney Moulton shall electronically file an entry of appearance on the form prescribed by the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 03/29/2023. (jb)
March 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel by Shawn Cox(individually). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order)(Burch, Richard)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The Second Entry of Appearance (Doc. No. #7 ) is STRICKEN from the case docket. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 03/17/2023. (jb)
March 15, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by David I Moulton on behalf of Shawn Cox(individually) (Moulton, David) STRICKEN on 3/17/2023 (jb).
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. The Entry of Appearance (Doc. No. #5 ) filed by attorney David I. Moulton is STRICKEN from the case docket, without prejudice to refiling in accordance with the local rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 03/14/2023. (jb)
March 14, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by David I Moulton on behalf of Shawn Cox(individually) (Moulton, David) STRICKEN on 3/14/2023 (jb).
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. Counsel for Plaintiff shall enter an appearance within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 03/09/2023. (jb)
March 8, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number AOKWDC-4108486 by Shawn Cox(individually). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court Admittance, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Moulton, David)
March 2, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to TJ Inspection Inc. (kb)
March 2, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4103806. (Burch, Richard)
February 24, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TJ Inspection Inc filed by Shawn Cox(individually), Shawn Cox(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. TJ Inspection Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Cox
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: David I Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TJ Inspection Inc
Represented By: Christopher S Thrutchley
Represented By: Robert A Bragalone
Represented By: Cathleen W McMahon
Represented By: Ryan A Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?