Milner et al v. Eagle Materials Inc et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Milner and Jason Milner
Defendant: Eagle Materials Inc, American Gypsum Co. LLC doing business as American Gypsum Co. OK, John Toler, Lyndell Cole and Titus Overman
Case Number: 5:2023cv00423
Filed: May 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPLY by Plaintiffs Jason Milner, Michelle Milner re #18 Response to Motion, #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All Plaintiffs. (Miller, Robert)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by American Gypsum Co. LLC, Eagle Materials Inc. (Stone, John)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Strike #6 Notice (other), #7 Notice (other), #8 Notice (other) filed by Lyndell Cole, Titus Overman, John Toler. (Stone, John)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY by Defendant Eagle Materials Inc in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss filed by Eagle Materials Inc. (Thompson, John)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support filed by All Plaintiffs. (Poe, Alyssa)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Strike #6 Notice (other), #7 Notice (other), #8 Notice (other) by All Plaintiffs. (Poe, Alyssa)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Poe, Alyssa)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Alyssa D Poe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Poe, Alyssa)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert Bradley Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Miller, Robert)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Brief in Support by Eagle Materials Inc. (Stone, John)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Original Petition by American Gypsum Co. LLC.(Stone, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE (other) by Lyndell Cole re #1 Notice of Removal,, Defendant Lyndell Cole's Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because He is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Stone, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE (other) by John Toler re #1 Notice of Removal,, Defendant John Toler's Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because He is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Stone, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE (other) by Titus Overman re #1 Notice of Removal,, Defendant Lyndell Cole's Notice in Lieu of a Responsive Pleading Because He is a Fraudulently Joined Defendant (Stone, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by John T Stone on behalf of All Defendants (Stone, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Eagle Materials Inc . (Thompson, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by American Gypsum Co. LLC . (Thompson, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John M Thompson on behalf of All Defendants (Thompson, John)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jackson County District Court, case number CJ-2023-52 filed by Titus Overman, John Toler, Eagle Materials Inc, Lyndell Cole, American Gypsum Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Entry of Appearance, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons to American Gypsum, #5 Exhibit 5 - Summons to Titus Overman, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons to Lyndell Cole, #7 Exhibit 7 - Summons to John Toler, #8 Exhibit 8 - Summons to Eagle Materials, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(kb)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4159597. (Stone, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Milner et al v. Eagle Materials Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Milner
Represented By: Alyssa D Poe
Represented By: Robert Bradley Miller
Represented By: Sean Patrick McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Milner
Represented By: Alyssa D Poe
Represented By: Robert Bradley Miller
Represented By: Sean Patrick McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Materials Inc
Represented By: John T Stone
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Gypsum Co. LLC doing business as American Gypsum Co. OK
Represented By: John T Stone
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Toler
Represented By: John T Stone
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndell Cole
Represented By: John T Stone
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Titus Overman
Represented By: John T Stone
Represented By: John M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?