Strucke et al v. Midland Financial Co et al
Plaintiff: Darryl Strucke
Defendant: Midland Financial Co, Ipswitch Inc and Progress Software Corporation
Case Number: 5:2023cv00782
Filed: September 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2023 Filing 17 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of District of Massachusetts for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Judge Allison D. Burroughs. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (naa)
November 2, 2023 Docket Annotation: Case sent to District of Massachusetts. (naa)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason K. Fagelman. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 11/1/2023. (jee)
October 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Defendant Midland Financial Co.s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Answer or Response due 12/1/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 10/31/2023. (jee)
October 30, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason Fagelman Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4283299 by Midland Financial Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - JKF Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Rother, Timila)
October 27, 2023 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony J Hendricks on behalf of Midland Financial Co (Hendricks, Anthony)
October 27, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of Midland Financial Co (Rother, Timila)
October 27, 2023 Filing 11 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition by Midland Financial Co. (Hoch, William)
October 27, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by William H Hoch, III on behalf of Midland Financial Co (Hoch, William)
October 25, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation . (Ottaway, Larry)
October 25, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Case Responsive Pleading Deadline by Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Transfer Order, #2 Exhibit 2-CTO-1)(Ottaway, Larry)
October 25, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Amy Sherry Fischer on behalf of Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation (Fischer, Amy)
October 25, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Larry D Ottaway on behalf of Ipswitch Inc, Progress Software Corporation (Ottaway, Larry)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons served on Defendant Progress Software Corporation on October 5, 2023, filed by Plaintiff Darryl Strucke. (Bean, Tyler)
October 10, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons served on Defendant Ipswitch, Inc. on October 5, 2023, filed by Plaintiff Darryl Strucke. (Bean, Tyler)
October 10, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Summons served on Defendant Midland Financial Co. on October 6, 2023, filed by Plaintiff Darryl Strucke. (Bean, Tyler)
September 8, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ipswitch Inc, Midland Financial Co, Progress Software Corporation. (ekw)
September 7, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4244981. (Bean, Tyler)
September 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ipswitch Inc, Midland Financial Co, Progress Software Corporation filed by Darryl Strucke(individually), Darryl Strucke(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strucke et al v. Midland Financial Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Strucke
Represented By: Tyler J Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Financial Co
Represented By: Anthony J Hendricks
Represented By: Timila S Rother
Represented By: William H Hoch, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipswitch Inc
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progress Software Corporation
Represented By: Amy Sherry Fischer
Represented By: Larry D Ottaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?