Great American Insurance Company v. Dolese Bros Co et al
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Dolese Bros Co and Jennifer Witte
Case Number: 5:2023cv01013
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: David L Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff is hereby granted an extension of time to and including January 9, 2024 in which to respond to Dolese Bros. Co.'s motion to dismiss and/or to decline jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David L. Russell on 12/20/2023. (km)
December 20, 2023 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or To Decline Jurisdiction by Great American Insurance Company. (Butler, Roger)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Dolese Bros Co . (Whitten, Reggie) Modified on 12/8/2023: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made (ekw).
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Great American Insurance Company . (Butler, Roger)
December 2, 2023 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Heather L Strohmeyer on behalf of Dolese Bros Co (Strohmeyer, Heather) Modified on 12/4/2023: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made (ekw).
December 2, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss and/or To Decline Jurisdiction by Dolese Bros Co. (Whitten, Reggie)
December 2, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Reggie N Whitten on behalf of Dolese Bros Co (Whitten, Reggie) Modified on 12/4/2023: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made (ekw).
December 2, 2023 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Hannah Whitten on behalf of Dolese Bros Co (Whitten, Hannah) Modified on 12/4/2023: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made (ekw).
December 2, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Randa K Reeves on behalf of Dolese Bros Co (Reeves, Randa) Modified on 12/4/2023: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made (ekw).
December 2, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of Dolese Bros Co (Burrage, Michael) Modified on 12/4/2023: document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made (ekw).
November 21, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company. Dolese Bros Co served on 11/16/2023. (Butler, Roger)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dolese Bros Co, Jennifer Witte. (ekw)
November 9, 2023 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by Nathaniel T Smith on behalf of Great American Insurance Company (Smith, Nathaniel)
November 9, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Roger N Butler, Jr on behalf of Great American Insurance Company (Butler, Roger)
November 9, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-4291605. (Butler, Roger)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dolese Bros Co, Jennifer Witte filed by Great American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Great American Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - High-Low Agreement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company v. Dolese Bros Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathaniel T Smith
Represented By: Roger N Butler, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolese Bros Co
Represented By: Hannah Whitten
Represented By: Heather L Strohmeyer
Represented By: Michael Burrage
Represented By: Randa K Reeves
Represented By: Reggie N Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?