Gabler v. United States of America et al
Petitioner: Paul E Gabler, II
Respondent: United States of America, General Merrick Garland, State of Oklahoma, Woodward County of Oklahoma and Terry Tuttle
Case Number: 5:2023cv01085
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Amanda Maxfield Green
Referring Judge: Joe Heaton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2023 Filing 7 Receipt for Money Received from Paul E Gabler, II in the amount of $5, receipt number 500005023 regarding #6 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended). Mailed receipt to Paul E Gabler, II #174255 BOLEY-JLCC #F-13 407971 Hwy 62E Boley, OK 74829 (naa)
December 26, 2023 Filing 6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Amended) filed by Paul E Gabler, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(naa)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to Cure Deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green on 12/5/2023. (rb)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Amanda Maxfield Green. Motions referred to Amanda Maxfield Green. Signed by direction of Judge Joe Heaton on 11/28/2023. (cps)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 No PREVIOUS Cases associated with prisoner filings. (cps)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Paul E Gabler, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certification of Institutional Accounts, #2 Envelope)(cps)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 Writ of Corpus Cum Causa Ad Testificandum against Merrick Garland, State of Oklahoma, United States of America, Woodward County of Oklahoma filed by Paul E Gabler, II. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Support Documents, #2 Envelope)(cps)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabler v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul E Gabler, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: General Merrick Garland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Woodward County of Oklahoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?