North Fork Operating LP v. Mewbourne Oil Company
Plaintiff: North Fork Operating LP
Defendant: Mewbourne Oil Company and Devon Energy Corporation
Case Number: 5:2023cv01187
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Timothy D DeGiusti
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REMANDING CASE and denying #9 Motion for Discovery; denying #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying #20 . Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 2/1/2024. (jee)
January 30, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Strike #17 Amended Complaint by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Corbyn, George)
January 30, 2024 Filing 19 REPLY by Defendant Mewbourne Oil Company re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Remanded, #9 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Corbyn, George)
January 23, 2024 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Remanded, #9 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) filed by North Fork Operating LP. (Woods, Christopher)
January 23, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by North Fork Operating LP.(Woods, Christopher)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer to the District of New Mexico #6 is extended until 21 days after the Court decides whether subject matter jurisdiction exists. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/22/2024. (jee)
January 19, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer to the District of New Mexico filed by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Corbyn, George)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiff is directed respond to Defendantspending motions [Doc. Nos. 9 and 10] not later than January 26, 2024.. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/18/2024. (jee)
January 18, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer to the District of New Mexico by North Fork Operating LP. (Henson, Trevor)
January 12, 2024 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Mewbourne Oil Company.(Corbyn, George)
January 12, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mewbourne Oil Company (First Amended) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Oklahoma Secretary of State Designation of Agent, #2 Exhibit 2. Oklahoma County District Court Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3. Verified Petition (State Court), #4 Exhibit 4. Summons - Returned (State Court), #5 Exhibit 5. Oklahoma County District Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Corbyn, George)
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Remanded by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Corbyn, George)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Affidavit of Katherine Dannenmaier, #2 Exhibit 2. December 29, 2023 R. Woods Email to T. Henson and C. Woods, #3 Exhibit 3. January 8, 2024 R. Woods Email to T. Henson)(Corbyn, George)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER striking #7 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 1/11/2024. (jee)
January 3, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery (Jurisdictional) by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Katherine Dannenmaier, #2 Exhibit 2. Mewbourne/North Fork Emails)(Corbyn, George)
January 3, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or to Transfer to the District of New Mexico by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Declaration of Corey Mitchell, #2 Exhibit 2. Declaration of John LuCore, #3 Exhibit 3. November 14, 2023 Letter to NMOCD)(Corbyn, George)
December 29, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher B Woods on behalf of North Fork Operating LP (Woods, Christopher)
December 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERThe Court finds Defendant Mewbourne Oil Companys Notice of Removal #1 insufficient to support Defendants assertion of diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332.1. Defendant Mewbourne Oil Company is directed to file an amended notice of removal, or show cause why this case should not be remanded, within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Timothy D. DeGiusti on 12/29/2023. (jee)
December 27, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Mewbourne Oil Company . (Corbyn, George)
December 27, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by George S Corbyn, Jr on behalf of Mewbourne Oil Company (Corbyn, George)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2023-6650 filed by Mewbourne Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - North Fork Designation of Agent Okla. Secretary of State, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court (Oklahoma County) Docket Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Verified Petition (Oklahoma County), #4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service of Summons (Oklahoma County), #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Oklahoma County), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(ekw)
December 27, 2023 PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4323401. (Corbyn, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North Fork Operating LP v. Mewbourne Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Fork Operating LP
Represented By: Trevor R Henson
Represented By: Christopher B Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mewbourne Oil Company
Represented By: George S Corbyn, Jr
Represented By: Robert D Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?