Shawver & Son Inc v. Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc et al
Plaintiff: Shawver & Son Inc
Defendant: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc and United Standard Electric LLC
Case Number: 5:2024cv00044
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma
Presiding Judge: Patrick R Wyrick
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENTER ORDER directing plaintiff's counsel, Joseph P. Krodel, to register for electronic case filing by March 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 3/8/2024. (ks)
March 7, 2024 Filing 24 MAY STATUS & SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2024 10:10 AM in Chambers before Judge Patrick R Wyrick. Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 5/1/2024. (ks)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying as moot #13 Defendant United Standard Electric LLC's Motion to Dismiss, as an amended complaint has been filed. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 2/27/2024. (ks)
February 23, 2024 Filing 22 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against United Standard Electric LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Shawver & Son Inc by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc.(Richardson, Brooks)
February 22, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by United Standard Electric LLC.(Combs, Eric)
February 22, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by United Standard Electric LLC.(Combs, Eric)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Defendant United Standard Electric, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Crossclaim of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, LLC. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 2/12/2024. (ks)
February 8, 2024 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Shawver & Son Inc.(Sadler, Daniel)
February 8, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by United Standard Electric LLC. (Combs, Eric)
February 6, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #5 Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer, Crossclaim, Counterclaim of Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc. by Shawver & Son Inc.(Sadler, Daniel)
February 6, 2024 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Shawver & Son Inc . (Sadler, Daniel)
February 6, 2024 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel L Sadler on behalf of Shawver & Son Inc (Sadler, Daniel)
February 2, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by United Standard Electric LLC. (Combs, Eric)
January 29, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. United Standard Electric LLC served on 1/22/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail/Proof of Service)(Richardson, Brooks)
January 29, 2024 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Cole Thomas McDaniel on behalf of Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (McDaniel, Cole)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Defendant United Standard Electric, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Removed Petition. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 1/22/2024. (ks)
January 19, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by United Standard Electric LLC. (Combs, Eric)
January 19, 2024 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric L Combs on behalf of United Standard Electric LLC (Combs, Eric) Modified on 1/23/2024 to flatten (kb).
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew K Felty on behalf of United Standard Electric LLC (Felty, Matthew) Modified on 1/23/2024 to flatten (kb).
January 18, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to United Standard Electric LLC. (kb)
January 18, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against United Standard Electric LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Shawver & Son Inc by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc.(Richardson, Brooks)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 Receipt for Money Received from Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc in the amount of $405, receipt number 500005234 regarding #1 Notice of Removal. Receipt mailed to csmith@gablelaw.com. (dtb)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc . (Richardson, Brooks) Modified on 1/16/2024 to flatten (kb).
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Brooks Allen Richardson on behalf of Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc (Richardson, Brooks)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2023-6857 filed by Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CJ-2023-6857 Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 - SEOA and Motion for Ext of Time to Answer, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Granting Motion for Ext of Time to Respond, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of David M. Lyons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(kb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oklahoma Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shawver & Son Inc v. Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawver & Son Inc
Represented By: Daniel L Sadler
Represented By: Joseph P Krodel
Represented By: Keith Barrett
Represented By: Sean Paul Rieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Electrical Distributors Inc
Represented By: Brooks Allen Richardson
Represented By: Cole Thomas McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Standard Electric LLC
Represented By: Eric L Combs
Represented By: Matthew K Felty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?