Bobadilla-German et al v. Bear Creek Orchards, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Elias Bobadilla-German, Jacobo Bobadilla-German, Vicente Fimbres Romero, Jose De Jesus Gaeta Bautista, Mauro German-Sanchez, Gilberto Padilla-Ortiz, Benjamin Urbalejo-Rodriguez, Victor Villanueva-Hernandez and Dario Angel Villegas-Meza |
Defendant: |
Bear Creek Orchards, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2007cv03058 |
Filed: |
August 16, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Oregon |
Office: |
Medford Office |
County: |
Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Mark D. Clarke |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Other |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1801 Farmworker Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 5, 2010 |
Filing
445
ORDER: Denying Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees 411 ; Denying Defendant's Taxation of Costs. 415 ; Granting in Part Plaintiff's Attorney Fees 417 ; Granting in Part Plaintiff's Taxation of Costs. 420 . Plaintiffs are awarded $13,005.72 in taxable costs and $58, 275.15 in attorney fees. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 5/5/2010 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
|
October 21, 2009 |
Filing
405
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Signed on 10/21/2009 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (wk)
|
June 25, 2009 |
Filing
377
Opinion and Order. The court grants partial summary judgment for Defendant on the late paychecks issue in Claim one. Plaintiffs' Motion 246 for Partial Summary Judgment (Claim One) is denied as to late paychecks. Ruling is reserved on the A WPA claim for all alleged recruitment violations (no written disclosures) and for allegedly omitting the EIN and employer address from the pay stub. Ruling is reversed on Plaintiffs' Motion 266 is for Partial Summary Judgment (Claim Two) and Defendant's Motion 241 for Partial Summary Judgment (Claim Two). Plaintiffs' Motion 192 for Partial Summary Judgment (Claim Three) is denied. Defendant's Motion 174 for Partial Summary Judgment (Claim Three) is granted as to pa ycheck advances, and otherwise denied. Plaintiffs' Motion 286 for Partial Summary Judgment (Claim Four) is denied. Defendant's Motion 185 for Partial Summary Judgment (Claim Four) is granted. Ruling is reserved on Plaintiffs' Motion 361 to supplement the Record. (Please access document by number hyperlink for complete review and details of Opinion and Order.) Signed on 6/25/2009 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
|
June 17, 2009 |
Filing
357
Opinion and Order. Plaintiffs' Motion 290 for leave to file an Amended Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Motion 293 to Correct/Amend the Order for Class Certification 118 is granted to the extent that the Sub-Class Three is deleted, and denied as to the other proposed modifications. Please access document by number hyperlink for complete review and details of Opinion and Order. Signed on 6/17/2009 by Judge Owen M. Panner. (dkj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?