Phillips v. Henry Schein Inc.
Plaintiff: David N. Phillips
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00340
Filed: February 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D. Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Granting Motion to Change or Transfer Venue (Related Doc # 44 ). Signed on 10/07/2019 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Opinion and Order: Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (#9) is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to refile and Amended Complaint within 30 days of this ruling. Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above or his case will be dismissed. Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP # 2 is held in abeyance and will be considered when the amended complaint is filed. Motion to Change or Transfer Venue 14 is denied. (A copy of this Order mailed to Plaintiff). Signed on 6/15/2018 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Based on the foregoing. Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to refile an Amended Complaint within thirty days of this ruling. Plaintiff must cure the deficiencies identified above or his case will be dismissed. Plaintiff's IFP application 2 is held in abeyance and will be considered when the amended complaint is filed. Plaintiff's Motionfor Appointment of Counsel 3 is denied. Signed on 02/27/2018 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) (rsm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David N. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?