Wagner v. Josephine County
Plaintiff: Richard Wagner
Defendant: Josephine County
Case Number: 1:2018cv01437
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities Act - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke: SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Conference for December 17, 2018 at 10:00 AM. The Court will initiate the call at the numbers provided, unless otherwise informed. At the time of the Conference, parties should have their calendars available to discuss scheduling matters, including modification of the current case deadlines, joining additional parties and amending the pleadings, dispositive motions, and setting a trial date. The parties shall consult pursuant to FRCP 26(f) regarding a focused and proportional discovery plan prior to the Conference. Under LR 26.1(b) a written report is not required. However, the parties should be prepared to briefly summarize the issues in the case and give the Court a realistic picture of what discovery needs to be completed. The ultimate goal of the discovery plan shall be "the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of the action. FRCP 1. If depositions are anticipated, the parties should confer prior to the Conference and have a firm date for the depositions scheduled prior to the conference. Parties shall confer prior to the Conference and consider whether the case could benefit from a streamlined approach, utilizing limited discovery and early dispositive motions, settlement conference, or an expedited trial date. Finally, if the parties intend to file written consents to a magistrate judge, it would be helpful to do so prior to the Rule 16 Conference, particularly if they want to secure a firm trial date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Answer to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand . Filed by Josephine County. (Franz, Robert)
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service upon Josephine County served on 8/7/2018 Answer due date 8/28/2018. Filed by Richard Wagner. (Payne, Shenoa) Modified on 8/13/2018 (jkm). To include answer due date.
August 3, 2018 Filing 8 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Owen B. Dunn Jr. (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: obdunn. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (jkm)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Owen B. Dunn, Jr for Richard Wagner. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5503413 issued. Signed on 8/2/2018 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Josephine County. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order,, #4 . Dispositive Motions are due by 12/31/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/30/2018. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/31/2018. Pretrial Order is due by 12/31/2018. Dispositive motions are due by 12/31/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Richard Wagner. (Payne, Shenoa)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5503399. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Richard Wagner against Richard Wagner (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Payne, Shenoa) Modified to add payment information on 8/2/2018. (eo)
August 1, 2018 Filing 1 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Owen B. Dunn, Jr. . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5503413. Filed by Richard Wagner. (Payne, Shenoa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wagner v. Josephine County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine County
Represented By: Robert E. Franz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Wagner
Represented By: Shenoa L. Payne
Represented By: Owen B. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?