T Bank, National Association v. Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC et al

Plaintiff: T Bank, National Association
Defendant: Daniel Gene Richardson, Patricia Michelle Richardson, Dennis Gene Richardson, Jessica Christine Richardson, Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC, DR & PR Investments, LLC and Patricia Michele Richardson
Case Number: 1:2018cv01620
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 Clerk's Entry of Default as to DR & PR Investments, LLC, Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC, Dennis Gene Richardson, Patricia Michele Richardson. (ck)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Motion for Entry of Default #16 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 23, 2018 Filing 17 Declaration of Gary L. Blacklidge . Filed by T Bank, National Association. (Related document(s): Motion for default #16 .) (Blacklidge, Gary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 16 Motion for Entry of Default Against Defendants Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC; DR & PR Investments, LLC; Dennis Gene Richardson; and Patricia Michele Richardson. Filed by T Bank, National Association. (Blacklidge, Gary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC served on 9/13/2018 Filed by T Bank, National Association. (Blacklidge, Gary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #6 upon Dennis Gene Richardson served on 9/18/2018 Filed by T Bank, National Association. (Blacklidge, Gary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon DR & PR Investments, LLC served on 9/13/2018 Filed by T Bank, National Association. (Blacklidge, Gary)
October 23, 2018 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #7 upon Patricia Michele Richardson served on 9/18/2018 Filed by T Bank, National Association. (Blacklidge, Gary)
September 26, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Bankruptcy for Defendants Daniel Gene Richardson and Jessica Christine Richardson Filed by T Bank, National Association. (Blacklidge, Gary)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Dennis Gene Richardson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jessica Christine Richardson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Daniel Gene Richardson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Patricia Michele Richardson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dennis Gene Richardson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to DR & PR Investments, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 2/11/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rsm)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 9/11/2018 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. (Breach of Promissory Note; Judicial Foreclosure of Trust Deed; and Breach of Guaranty) Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5542632 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by T Bank, National Association against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons DR & PR Investments, LLC, #4 Proposed Summons Dennis Gene Richardson, #5 Proposed Summons Patricia Michelle Richardson, #6 Proposed Summons Jessica Christine Richardson, #7 Proposed Summons Daniel Gene Richardson). (Blacklidge, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T Bank, National Association v. Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Gene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Michelle Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gene Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Christine Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon-CV Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR & PR Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Michele Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T Bank, National Association
Represented By: Gary L. Blacklidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?