Carpenter v. Carpenter
Plaintiff: Sunny D. Carpenter
Defendant: John A. Carpenter, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01792
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #9 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cauble, Christopher)
November 19, 2018 Filing 11 Declaration of Mark R. Weaver in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by John A. Carpenter, Jr. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #9 .) (Weaver, Mark)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 Affidavit of John A. Carpenter, Jr. in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by John A. Carpenter, Jr. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #9 .) (Weaver, Mark)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Oral Argument requested. Filed by John A. Carpenter, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Weaver, Mark)
October 31, 2018 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Cauble, Christopher)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to John A. Carpenter, Jr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Proposed Summons as to All Plaintiffs. (Cauble, Christopher) Modified on 10/11/2018 (jkm). Incorrect event selected. Clerk modified text and issued amended summons.
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to John A. Carpenter, Jr. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order,, #2 . Dispositive Motions are due by 3/8/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/8/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/8/2019. Dispositive motions are due 3/8/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5587162 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Sunny D. Carpenter against John A. Carpenter (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Cauble, Christopher) Modified on 10/9/2018 (jkm). To Correct Filer.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunny D. Carpenter
Represented By: Christopher L. Cauble
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Carpenter, Jr.
Represented By: Mark R. Weaver
Represented By: David B. Paradis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?