Stratton et al v. Webb et al

Plaintiff: BARBARA A STRATTON, O.E.M. Trailers, LLC, HARLAN T STRATTON, Barbara A. Stratton and Harlan T. Stratton
Defendant: RNO Exhibitions LLC, Hellgate Ranch LLC, Vincent L. Webb and Trailers Intl LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01802
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Josephine County Circuit Court regarding Transmittal of Case to State Court #12 , Transmittal form, Judgment & Docket. Clerk to check Josephine County Circuit Court on 11/26/2018. (jkm)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Transmittal of Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to Josephine County Circuit Court. (jkm)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Judgment. Based on the stipulated order on remand #8 , judgment is hereby entered and this case is remanded to the Josephine County Oregon Circuit Court. Signed on 11/01/2018 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order regarding Judgment #9 . The Court Orders that Judgment #9 be sealed and vacated and a new Judgment entered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 "SEALED" Judgment. Based on the stipulated order on remand (#8) signed by the parties and this Court, judgment is hereby entered and this case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees of any kind. Ordered and Signed on 10/25/2018 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm) Modified on 11/1/2018 (rsm) This Judgment is sealed and vacated and a new Judgment has been entered.
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Stipulated Order on Remand. The parties hereby stipulate this proceeding should be remanded to the Josephine County Circuit Court. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Ordered and Signed on 10/24/2018 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted Order on Remand. Filed by Harlan T. Stratton. (Rote, Frank)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand , Counterclaim Harlan T. Stratton, Barbara A. Stratton. Filed by Hellgate Ranch LLC, Vincent L. Webb, Trailers Intl LLC, RNO Exhibitions LLC. (Joncus, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #3 . Dispositive Motions are due by 3/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/11/2019. Dispositive motions are due 3/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 11, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Service by All Defendants of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal of Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) Filed by All Defendants. (Joncus, Stephen)
October 11, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18cv28699 from Oregon Circuit Court - Josephine County. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5590002 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Hellgate Ranch LLC, Vincent L. Webb, Trailers Intl LLC, RNO Exhibitions LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Joncus, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stratton et al v. Webb et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A STRATTON
Represented By: Frank C. Rote, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.E.M. Trailers, LLC
Represented By: Frank C. Rote, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARLAN T STRATTON
Represented By: Frank C. Rote, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara A. Stratton
Represented By: Frank C. Rote, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harlan T. Stratton
Represented By: Frank C. Rote, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RNO Exhibitions LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hellgate Ranch LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent L. Webb
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trailers Intl LLC
Represented By: Stephen J. Joncus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?