Goins v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Christine Goins
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2018cv01853
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 4 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/31/2018, answer due on 2/28/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Haapala, John)
October 22, 2018 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
October 19, 2018 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5601642. Filed by Christine Goins against Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Goins, #2 Proposed Summons Goins). (Haapala, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goins v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Goins
Represented By: John E. Haapala, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?