Hershey v. Kaber et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Hershey
Defendant: Sheriff Chris Kaber and Judge Andrea Janney
Case Number: 1:2018cv01888
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Andrea Janney. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (jkm)
December 19, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Chris Kaber. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (jkm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Kenneth Hershey regarding Order on motion/application for leave to proceed ifp #5 , Discovery order,, #6 , Scheduling 7 . (jkm)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order,, #6 . Dispositive Motions are due by 3/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/27/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/29/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 3/29/2019. Dispositive motions are due 3/29/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Kenneth Hershey regarding Case Assignment Notice #3 . (jkm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kenneth Hershey. (jkm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kenneth Hershey against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (jkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hershey v. Kaber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Chris Kaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Andrea Janney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Hershey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?