Rice v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: David Wayne Rice, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv00753
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 5/29/2019. Service specifically made upon U.S. Attorney General. (jkm)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Jeffrey E. Staples appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Staples, Jeffrey)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkm)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed Service specifically made upon Regional Counsel or Agency. (jkm)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 5/23/2019, answer due on 9/20/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney. (jkm)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (jkm)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 5/15/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/15/2019.) (pvh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to David Rice regarding Social Security Procedural Order #3 . (jkm)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jkm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by David Wayne Rice, Jr. (jkm)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner. Filed by David Wayne Rice, Jr against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (jkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rice v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wayne Rice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?