Lagler v. Oregon Institute of Technology
Plaintiff: Hannah Lagler
Defendant: Oregon Institute of Technology
Case Number: 1:2019cv00945
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Affidavit of Service #6 .Oregon Institute of Technology Answer is due by 8/23/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #5 upon Oregon Institute of Technology served on 8/2/2019 Filed by Hannah Lagler. (Lafky, Kevin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Institute of Technology. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Hannah Lagler. (Lafky, Kevin)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #2 . Dispositive Motions are due by 11/14/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/15/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/14/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/14/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5890405 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Hannah Lagler against Oregon Institute of Technology (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lafky, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagler v. Oregon Institute of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Lagler
Represented By: Tonyia J. Brady
Represented By: Kevin T. Lafky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Institute of Technology
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?