O'Brien v. Josephine County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Teresa O'Brien
Defendant: Nicholas Boyers, Edward Vincent, Josephine County Sheriff's Office, Ray Webb, Travis Snyder and Dave Daniel
Case Number: 1:2019cv01053
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 Summons Issued Electronically as to Travis Snyder. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued Electronically as to Josephine County Sheriff's Office. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ray Webb. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued Electronically as to Nicholas Boyers. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued Electronically as to Edward Vincent. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Dave Daniel. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 Amended Proposed Summons of Travis Snyder Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons of Travis Snyder Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons of Josephine County Sheriff's Office Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons of Ray Webb Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons of Nicholas Boyers Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons of Edward Vincent Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons of Dave Daniel Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #3 . Dispositive Motions are due by 12/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/5/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Teresa O'Brien. (Linder, Larry)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5914744 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Teresa O'Brien against All Defendants. (Linder, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien v. Josephine County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Boyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa O'Brien
Represented By: Larry L. Linder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?