Sunny v. Met One Instruments, Inc.

Plaintiff: David Sunny
Defendant: Met One Instruments, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01058
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke: "RESETTING" the telephonic Rule 16 Conference from September 23, 2019 at 9:00 AM to October 21, 2019 at 10:00 AM. Conference call information will be provided in a separate entry. At the time of the Conference, parties should have their calendars available to discuss scheduling matters, including modification of the current case deadlines, joining additional parties and amending the pleadings, dispositive motions, and setting a trial date. The parties shall consult pursuant to FRCP 26(f) regarding a focused and proportional discovery plan prior to the Conference. Under LR 26.1(b) a written report is not required. However, the parties should be prepared to briefly summarize the issues in the case and give the Court a realistic picture of what discovery needs to be completed. The ultimate goal of the discovery plan shall be "the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of the action. FRCP 1. If depositions are anticipated, the parties should confer prior to the Conference and have a firm date for the depositions scheduled prior to the conference. Parties shall confer prior to the Conference and consider whether the case could benefit from a streamlined approach, utilizing limited discovery and early dispositive motions, settlement conference, or an expedited trial date. Finally, if the parties intend to file written consents to a magistrate judge, it would be helpful to do so prior to the Rule 16 Conference, particularly if they want to secure a firm trial date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Status Report and Proposed Case Management Schedule. Filed by David Sunny. (Meyer, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke: SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Conference for September 23, 2019 at 9:00 AM. Conference call information will be provided in a separate entry. At the time of the Conference, parties should have their calendars available to discuss scheduling matters, including modification of the current case deadlines, joining additional parties and amending the pleadings, dispositive motions, and setting a trial date. The parties shall consult pursuant to FRCP 26(f) regarding a focused and proportional discovery plan prior to the Conference. Under LR 26.1(b) a written report is not required. However, the parties should be prepared to briefly summarize the issues in the case and give the Court a realistic picture of what discovery needs to be completed. The ultimate goal of the discovery plan shall be "the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of the action. FRCP 1. If depositions are anticipated, the parties should confer prior to the Conference and have a firm date for the depositions scheduled prior to the conference. Parties shall confer prior to the Conference and consider whether the case could benefit from a streamlined approach, utilizing limited discovery and early dispositive motions, settlement conference, or an expedited trial date. Finally, if the parties intend to file written consents to a magistrate judge, it would be helpful to do so prior to the Rule 16 Conference, particularly if they want to secure a firm trial date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Met One Instruments, Inc.. (Hanks, Bryce)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Met One Instruments, Inc.. (Hanks, Bryce)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Affidavit of Service #6 .Met One Instruments, Inc.'s, Answer is due by 8/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #5 upon Met One Instruments, Inc. served on 7/12/2019 Filed by David Sunny. (Meyer, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Met One Instruments, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #3 . Dispositive Motions are due by 12/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/6/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by David Sunny. (Meyer, Robert)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5916633 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by David Sunny against Met One Instruments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Meyer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunny v. Met One Instruments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Met One Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah J. Ryan
Represented By: Bryce W. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sunny
Represented By: Robert K. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?