United States of America v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jackson County, Stephen L. Chapman and Jeannette A. Fry
Case Number: 1:2019cv01139
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service by United States of America of Summons/Service Return #8 , Waiver of Service Summons #9 Filed by United States of America. (Valdman, Rika)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jackson County waiver sent on 8/6/2019. Filed by United States of America. (Valdman, Rika)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Jeannette A. Fry served on 8/13/2019, answer due on 9/3/2019. (Valdman, Rika)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jackson County. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Jeannette A. Fry. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Stephen L. Chapman. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #3 . Dispositive Motions are due by 12/3/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/23/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/23/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) Filed by United States of America. (Valdman, Rika)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against Stephen L. Chapman, Jeannette A. Fry, Jackson County (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Stephen L. Chapman, #3 Proposed Summons Jeannette A. Fry, #4 Proposed Summons Jackson County). (Valdman, Rika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen L. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannette A. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?