Mellow v. Josephine County
Plaintiff: Ronald Vincent Mellow
Defendant: Josephine County
Case Number: 1:2019cv01230
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 JUDGMENT: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and based on Plaintiff's request, this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are therefore DENIED as MOOT. Signed on 9/19/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/19/2019.) (ck)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 Notice. Filed by Ronald Vincent Mellow. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (bd)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of correspondence from the pro se plaintiff received 9/18/2019. The Clerk shall file this correspondence as a notice. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/19/2019.) (ck)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER: The Amended Complaint #8 is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to file a second amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file a second amended complaint within the allotted time will result in the entry of a judgment of dismissal. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's petition to proceed IFP #2 , and Plaintiff's motions for appointment ofcounsel #3 , #9 , until Plaintiff files a second amended complaint or the time for doing so has expired. Signed on 8/20/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/20/2019.) (ck)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (rsm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Ronald Vincent Mellow. (rsm)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Complaint. Filed by Ronald Vincent Mellow against Josephine County. (rsm)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: The Complaint #1 is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended complaint within the allotted time will result in the entry of a judgment of dismissal. The Court defers ruling on Plaintiff's petition to proceed IFP #2 until Plaintiff files an amended complaint or the time for doing so has expired. Signed on 8/9/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck) (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/9/2019.)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 8/7/2019 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/7/2019.) (ck)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Ronald Mellow regarding Case Assignment Notice #4 . (jkm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Ronald Vincent Mellow. (jkm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Ronald Vincent Mellow. (jkm)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ronald Vincent Mellow against Josephine County (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (jkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mellow v. Josephine County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Vincent Mellow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?