Estate of John Wesley Counts v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Estate of John Wesley Counts
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01299
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke: SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Conference for November 4, 2019 at 10:00 AM. Conference call information will be provided in a separate entry. At the time of the Conference, parties should have their calendars available to discuss scheduling matters, including modification of the current case deadlines, joining additional parties and amending the pleadings, dispositive motions, and setting a trial date. The parties shall consult pursuant to FRCP 26(f) regarding a focused and proportional discovery plan prior to the Conference. Under LR 26.1(b) a written report is not required. However, the parties should be prepared to briefly summarize the issues in the case and give the Court a realistic picture of what discovery needs to be completed. The ultimate goal of the discovery plan shall be "the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of the action. FRCP 1. If depositions are anticipated, the parties should confer prior to the Conference and have a firm date for the depositions scheduled prior to the conference. Parties shall confer prior to the Conference and consider whether the case could benefit from a streamlined approach, utilizing limited discovery and early dispositive motions, settlement conference, or an expedited trial date. Finally, if the parties intend to file written consents to a magistrate judge, it would be helpful to do so prior to the Rule 16 Conference, particularly if they want to secure a firm trial date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Spooner, Ralph)
August 27, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) , Counterclaim for Declaratory Relief against Estate of John Wesley Counts. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Spooner, Ralph)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and transferred to the Medford Division. (eo)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: As it appears that all events giving rise to the claim occurred in Jackson County, this case shall be transferred to the Medford divisional office for venue purposes. (gm)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/17/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/16/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/16/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sss)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV33751 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5966411 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Spooner, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of John Wesley Counts v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of John Wesley Counts
Represented By: Robert M. Brian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Ralph C. Spooner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?