Barrett et al v. City of Medford
Plaintiff: Robert Barrett and The Edge Nightclub and Patio, LLC
Defendant: City of Medford
Case Number: 1:2019cv01572
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT:. Judgment is hereby entered Pursuant to FRCP 41, Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #5 filed 10/15/2019. This case is dismissed without prejudice. DATED this 16th day of October,2019. (jkm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Button, Melisa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to City of Medford. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #2 . Dispositive Motions are due by 3/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/31/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/2/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/2/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6024815 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Robert Barrett, The Edge Nightclub and Patio, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Button, Melisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. City of Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Barrett
Represented By: Ryan J. Vanderhoof
Represented By: Melisa A. Button
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Edge Nightclub and Patio, LLC
Represented By: Ryan J. Vanderhoof
Represented By: Melisa A. Button
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Medford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?