United States of America v. Sesma et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Oregon Department of Revenue, Red Sunset Enterprises, Coral Skies Enterprises, Jim L. Sesma, Laura D. Sesma and Jackson County, Oregon
Case Number: 1:2019cv01581
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 Notice (Titled Common-Law Abatement) Filed by Jim L. Sesma. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jkm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Jackson County, Oregon. (Baumann, Brett)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service upon Coral Skies Enterprises served on 11/5/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Jim L. Sesma served on 11/5/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service upon Laura D. Sesma served on 11/5/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon Red Sunset Enterprises served on 11/5/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon Jackson County, Oregon served on 11/1/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon Oregon Department of Revenue served on 10/31/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Stevko, Alexander)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Coral Skies Enterprises, Jackson County, Oregon, Oregon Department of Revenue, Red Sunset Enterprises, Jim L. Sesma, Laura D. Sesma. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 2/4/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/5/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 3/5/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. to reduce tax assessments to judgment and foreclose federal tax liens (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Stevko, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sesma et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Revenue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Sunset Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Skies Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim L. Sesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura D. Sesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County, Oregon
Represented By: Brett A. Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexander Stevko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?