White et al v. Reeves et al
Plaintiff: Applied Extracts, Inc. and James White
Defendant: Bradley Reeves, Oregon Hemp Tea Company, L.L.C. and Oregon Drying Technologies, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00412
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Referring Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Amended Motion for Order to Show Cause Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #21 . Telephonic Oral Argument is set for 5/12/2020 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. The Court will provide teleconference information in a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Amended Motion for Order to Show Cause Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #21 . Courts Orders Reply deadline by 05/8/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
May 6, 2020 Filing 23 Declaration of Bradley Reeves . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #22 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Billin, Richard)
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 Response to Amended Motion for Order to Show Cause Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #21 , Motion for Preliminary Injunction #12 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Billin, Richard)
April 29, 2020 Filing 21 Amended Motion for Order to Show Cause , Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of James White, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service) (Robertson, Robert)
April 27, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Ann L. Aiken to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (eo)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #18 Consent to a Magistrate. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
April 23, 2020 Filing 18 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jkm) (Main Document 18 replaced on 4/23/2020) (cw).
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
April 15, 2020 Filing 16 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 Reply to Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Answer to Amended Complaint #13 .) (Robertson, Robert)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Oregon Drying Technologies, L.L.C., Oregon Hemp Tea Company, L.L.C., Bradley Reeves. (Billin, Richard)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 Answer to #11 Amended Complaint . Filed by Oregon Drying Technologies, L.L.C., Bradley Reeves, Oregon Hemp Tea Company, L.L.C.. (Billin, Richard)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Declaration of James White, #2 Attachment Memo in Support of Motion) (Robertson, Robert)
March 30, 2020 Filing 11 Amended Complaint . Filed by James White against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Art. of Organization, #2 Exhibit 2 Operating Agreement, #3 Exhibit 3 Art. of Organization). (Robertson, Robert)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann L. Aiken regarding Affidavit of Service #9 .Bradley Reeves Answer is due by 4/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm)
March 20, 2020 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Service, #2 Attachment Affidavit of Service) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Robertson, Robert)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Hemp Tea Company, L.L.C.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Oregon Drying Technologies, L.L.C.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 A duplicate payment in the amount of $400.00 was submitted by James White in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 3/23/2020. (nd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) Filed by Applied Extracts, Inc., James White. (Robertson, Robert)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 3/12/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bradley Reeves. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/10/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 8/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jkm)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-6391400 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by James White, APPLIED EXTRACTS, INC. against OREGON DRYING TECHNOLOGIES, OREGON HEMP TEA COMPANY, BRADLEY REEVES (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons). (Robertson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Reeves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applied Extracts, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Robert C. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Reeves
Represented By: Richard L. Billin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Hemp Tea Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard L. Billin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Drying Technologies, L.L.C.
Represented By: Richard L. Billin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?