Wellman v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: James Albert Wellman
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv00541
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Referring Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael J. McShane to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (eo)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Pursuant to Standing Order 06-mc-9130, the United States consents to jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of L. Jamala Edwards appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Edwards, L. Jamala)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 4/13/2020, answer due on 8/11/2020. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Wilborn, Tim)
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (rsm)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by James Albert Wellman. (Wilborn, Tim)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by James Albert Wellman against Commissioner Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Wilborn, Tim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wellman v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: L. Jamala Edwards
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Albert Wellman
Represented By: Tim D. Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?