Cortes-Diaz et al v. DL Reforestation, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Cortes-Diaz and Jose Manuel Cortes-Diaz
Defendant: DL Reforestation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00666
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Wendel V. Hall. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6865209. Filed by DL Reforestation, Inc.. (Jarvis, Darrel)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by DL Reforestation, Inc. waiver sent on 5/20/2020. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ledesma, Mayra)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to DL Reforestation, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery order, #2 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 8/21/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 8/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/21/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 9/21/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6575885 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Lorenzo Cortes-Diaz, Jose Manuel Cortes-Diaz against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Ledesma, Mayra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortes-Diaz et al v. DL Reforestation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Cortes-Diaz
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Manuel Cortes-Diaz
Represented By: D. Michael Dale
Represented By: Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich
Represented By: Mayra Ledesma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DL Reforestation, Inc.
Represented By: Darrel R. Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?