Fogel v. Dept. Health & Human Services
Plaintiff: Mindy Fogel
Defendant: Dept. Health & Human Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv00762
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Office: Medford (1) Office
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: The Complaint #1 , is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file an amended complaint within the allotted time will result in a judgment of dismissal. The Court will defer ruling on Plaintiffs IFP Petition, #2 , pending submission of an amended complaint. Amended Complaint is due 6/15/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/13/2020.) (cp) Modified on 5/14/2020 to correct docket text. Resent NEF (cp).
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/13/2020.) (jkm)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Mindy Fogel. (plb)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Mindy Fogel against Dept. Health & Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (plb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fogel v. Dept. Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept. Health & Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mindy Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?