Pringle v. Arce et al
Petitioner: Eugene Dayton Pringle, Jr
Respondent: Attorney General Ellen F. Rosenblum, Assessor Eva L I Arce, Josephine County Board of County Commissioners and Governor Kate Brown
Case Number: 1:2020cv01323
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition. Filed by Eugene Dayton Pringle, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Proposed First Amended Complaint, #3 Attachment Certificate of Service) (rsm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Ellen F. Rosenblum waiver sent on 9/3/2020. Filed by Eugene Dayton Pringle, Jr. (rsm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Eva L I Arce waiver sent on 8/24/2020; Josephine County Board of County Commissioners waiver sent on 8/24/2020. Filed by Eugene Dayton Pringle, Jr. (rsm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Kate Brown waiver sent on 9/3/2020. Filed by Eugene Dayton Pringle, Jr. (rsm)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for TRO #1 is DENIED. Signed on 8/11/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/11/2020.) (ck)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order,, #6 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 12/4/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/6/2020.) (jkm)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/4/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/4/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/6/2020.) (jkm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ellen F. Rosenblum. (jkm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Josephine County Board of County Commissioners. (jkm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kate Brown. (jkm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Eva L I Arce. (jkm)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint AND Motion for TRO. Fee Paid in the amount of $400.00 Receipt No. #4199. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Eugene Dayton Pringle, Jr against Eva L I Arce, Kate Brown, Josephine County Board of County Commissioners, Ellen F. Rosenblum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet). (jkm) Modified on 8/6/2020 (jkm). To update fee paid. No regeneration of NEF new case.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pringle v. Arce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eugene Dayton Pringle, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Assessor Eva L I Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josephine County Board of County Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Governor Kate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?