Hayes v. State of Oregon et al
Plaintiff: Francis Steffan Hayes
Defendant: State of Oregon and Kate Brown
Case Number: 1:2020cv01332
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #17 Notice. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The document was missing a case caption cover page. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF that includes a case caption cover page has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. (eo)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 Notice re Motion for Preliminary Injunction #13 , Objection #14 , Motion to Recuse, Motion for Reconsideration #11 Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #13 , Objection #14 , Motion to Recuse, Motion for Reconsideration #11 .) (Hayes, Francis) (Main Document 17 replaced on 9/3/2020) (eo).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 20-35736 re Notice of Appeal - Preliminary Injunction #15 . The August 20, 2020 notice of appeal is therefore ineffective until entry of the order disposing of the last such motion outstanding. See Fed. R. App. P. 4(a)(4). Accordingly, proceedings in this court are held in abeyance pending the district courts resolution of the pending August 13, 2020 motion for reconsideration. See Leader Natl Ins. Co. v. Indus. Indem. Ins. Co., 19 F.3d 444, 445 (9th Cir. 1994). Within 14 days after the district courts ruling on the pending motion, appellant shall file a written notice in this court: (1) informing this court of the district courts ruling; and (2) stating whether appellant intends to prosecute this appeal. To appeal the district courts ruling on the post-judgment motion, appellant must file an amended notice of appeal within the time prescribed by Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4. The Clerk shall serve this order on the district court. (jkm)
August 21, 2020 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal - Preliminary Injunction #15 . Case Appealed to 9TH Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 20-35736 assigned. (jkm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit Filing fee $505 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7135167. Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (Hayes, Francis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 Objection(s) . Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (Related document(s): Motion for Preliminary Injunction #13 , Motion to Recuse #12 , Motion to Recuse, Motion for Reconsideration #11 , Opinion and Order #9 .) (Hayes, Francis)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Hayes, Francis)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Recuse . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (Hayes, Francis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to Recuse , Motion for Reconsideration of Motion for Preliminary Injunction #8 . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (Hayes, Francis)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kate Brown, State of Oregon. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND OPINION: Plaintiff's motion for a TRO #1 and Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction #8 are DENIED. Signed on 8/12/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (Hayes, Francis)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #6 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 12/10/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/11/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/10/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/11/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 1/11/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #3 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (jkm)
August 12, 2020 Filing fee in amount of $400.00 collected; Receipt No. 4201 issued. (jkm)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Application for CM/ECF Registration as a Self-Represented Party. Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes. (jkm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/7/2020.) (jkm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint and Motion for TRO Jury Trial Requested: Filing fee $400.00 paid 8/12/2020, Receipt #4201, Civil Cover Sheet filed 8/12/2020 Filed by Francis Steffan Hayes against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Attachment). (jkm) Modified on 8/12/2020 (jkm). To update fee paid status and JS44 filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. State of Oregon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Oregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francis Steffan Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?