Marshall v. Peters
Plaintiff: George Lee Marshall, Jr.
Defendant: Colette S. Peters
Case Number: 1:2020cv01420
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit the $400.00 filing fee or a completed application to proceed IFP-with a certified copy of his inmate trust account - within 30 days from receipt of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed on 10/9/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.(Mailed order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 10/9/2020.) (dsg)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (rsm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/20/2020.) (dsg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by George Lee Marshall, Jr against Colette S. Peters. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Lee Marshall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colette S. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?