Grasco Hemp, LLC v. Drying Solutions, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Grasco Hemp, LLC
Defendant: Drying Solutions, LLC, Colt Hansen, Shea McInvale and Adam Popejoy
Case Number: 1:2020cv01606
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court received notice from Plaintiff that Plaintiff received full payment from defendants on 04/01/2021, and that no further action from the Court is needed. Therefore, Plaintiffs motions to enforce the settlement agreement #9 and #11 are DENIED as moot. This action is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Motion #9 , Amended Motion #11 . The oral argument set for 03/31/2021 at 2:00 PM is vacated. The Court will rule on Motions #9 #11 as filed without oral argument. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Amended Motion #11 , Motion #9 . Telephonic Oral Argument is set for 3/31/2021 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 Amended Declaration of Peter A. Grasco . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #11 .) (Cauble, Christopher)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 Amended Motion . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cauble, Christopher)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 Declaration of Peter A. Grasco . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cauble, Christopher)
February 16, 2021 Filing 9 Motion . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cauble, Christopher)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (rsm)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Affidavit of Service #6 . Answers are due by 10/20/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document, #2 Proposed Document, #3 Proposed Document) Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cauble, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 1/13/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Drying Solutions, LLC, Colt Hansen, Shea McInvale, Adam Popejoy. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons) (cw)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 12/31/2020. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/12/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cw)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/13/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/12/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/12/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (cw)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7236750. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Grasco Hemp, LLC against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons). (Cauble, Christopher) Modified on 9/15/2020 to add payment information. (eo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grasco Hemp, LLC v. Drying Solutions, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drying Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shea McInvale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Popejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grasco Hemp, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Cauble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?