loanDepot.com, LLC v. Towery
Plaintiff: loanDepot.com, LLC
Defendant: Michael Towery
Case Number: 1:2020cv01628
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: The parties having notified the Court that they continue to work toward finalizing the settlement of this matter, IT IS ORDERED that the parties are granted leave, upon good cause shown by 8/20/2021, to have the order of dismissal, ECF No. 30, set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (plb) Corrected typographical errors and resent NEF on 8/16/2021 (plb).
June 14, 2021 Filing 30 60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (cp)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Joint Status Report is due by 6/21/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
May 20, 2021 Filing 28 Notice Notice of Law Firm Name Change Filed by Michael Towery. (Honda, Shanelle)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Based upon the request of the parties, the Oral Argument set for 4/7/2021 is vacated. The parties are to file a Joint Status Report by 6/7/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Based upon the request of the parties, the Oral Argument set for 3/3/2021 is reset for 4/7/2021 at 11:00AM in Eugene by video conference before Judge Michael J. McShane. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Oral Argument regarding Motion to Dismiss #12 is set for 3/3/2021 at 11:00AM in Eugene by video conference before Judge Michael J. McShane. The 2/10/2021 Discovery Conference is vacated. Discovery and pretrial order deadlines are stayed pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss #12 . Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Based upon the request of the parties, the Discovery Hearing set for 09:30AM is reset for 01:00PM on 2/10/2021 in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. The parties are to call the previously emailed conference call-in number. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane. Based upon the request of the parties, Discovery Hearing is set for 2/10/2021 at 09:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #20 . Andrew M. DeLucia on behalf of Michael Towery. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #19 . Cynthia B. Morgan on behalf of Michael Towery. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew M. DeLucia. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7872166. Filed by Michael Towery. (DeLucia, Andrew)
February 8, 2021 Filing 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cynthia B. Morgan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7871993. Filed by Michael Towery. (Morgan, Cynthia)
February 8, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Cynthia B. Morgan. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7871993 #19 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
February 8, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Andrew M. DeLucia. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7872166 #20 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
January 25, 2021 Filing 18 Reply Defendant's Reply in Support of His Motion to Dismiss to Motion to Dismiss #12 oral argument requested. Filed by Michael Towery. (Honda, Shanelle)
January 11, 2021 Filing 17 Response to Motion to Dismiss #12 Oral Argument requested. Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC. (Larkins, William)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines #14 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/19/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/19/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/17/2021. If needed, the Pretrial Order deadline will be set in the trial management order. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss #12 . Response is due by 1/11/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC. (Benedick, Kelsey)
December 16, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss #12 . Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC. (Benedick, Kelsey)
December 14, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to Dismiss . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael Towery. (Honda, Shanelle)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #9 . Stephanie Collett Sparks on behalf of loanDepot.com,LLC. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #7 . Answer is due by 12/14/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
December 7, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Stephanie Sparks. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: CORDC-7588004 #9 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
December 4, 2020 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Stephanie Sparks. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: CORDC-7588004. Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC. (Sparks, Stephanie)
December 2, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Shanelle A. Honda appearing on behalf of Michael Towery Filed by on behalf of Michael Towery. (Honda, Shanelle)
November 25, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Michael Towery. (Sand, Thomas)
November 10, 2020 Filing 6 Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint and Civil Case Assignment Order Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #4 upon Michael Towery served on 11/6/2020 Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC. (Larkins, William)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC. (Larkins, William)
September 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Towery. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC. (Larkins, William)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/19/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/16/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/16/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cw)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7253688 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by loanDepot.com, LLC against Michael Towery (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Larkins, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: loanDepot.com, LLC v. Towery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: loanDepot.com, LLC
Represented By: Kelsey M. Benedick
Represented By: William L. Larkins, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Towery
Represented By: Andrew Michael DeLucia
Represented By: Cynthia Morgan
Represented By: Shanelle A. Honda
Represented By: Thomas C. Sand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?