Foundation of Human Understanding v. Talk Radio Network, Inc.
Plaintiff: Foundation of Human Understanding and The Foundation of Human Understanding
Defendant: Talk Radio Network, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01652
Filed: September 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance of Kevin R. Schock appearing on behalf of Foundation of Human Understanding Filed by on behalf of Foundation of Human Understanding. (Schock, Kevin)
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance of Douglas R. Pahl appearing on behalf of Foundation of Human Understanding Filed by on behalf of Foundation of Human Understanding. (Pahl, Douglas)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance of Stephen F. English appearing on behalf of Foundation of Human Understanding Filed by on behalf of Foundation of Human Understanding. (English, Stephen)
November 14, 2020 Filing 16 Answer to #15 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim . Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (Cox, Conde)
November 2, 2020 Filing 15 Answer to #14 Amended Complaint , Counterclaim All Plaintiffs. Filed by Talk Radio Network, Inc. (Cauble, Christopher)
October 21, 2020 Filing 14 (Document Filed Under Seal) Amended Complaint. Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding against Talk Radio Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D). (plb)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time For Filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #11 . Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Unopposed Motion to Seal Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #10 . Signed on 10/21/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time For Filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Cox, Conde)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion to Seal Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Filed by Foundation of Human Understanding. (plb)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 Answer to Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim #8 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal, Counterclaim #8 .) (Attachments: #1 Promissory Note, #2 Schedule) (Cox, Conde)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #2 ) , Counterclaim All Plaintiffs. Filed by Talk Radio Network, Inc. (Cauble, Christopher)
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 Declaration of Christopher L. Cauble . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Attorney Appearance #6 .) (Cauble, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 Amended Notice of Appearance of Conde T. Cox appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cox, Conde)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Conde T. Cox appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cox, Conde)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 9/23/2020 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/21/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/22/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/22/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cw)
September 23, 2020 Filing 2 Amended Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV29287 from Josephine County Circuit Court, State of Oregon. . Filed by TALK RADIO NETWORK, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Whittington, Max) Modified on 9/23/2020, to removed IFP information(cw).
September 23, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 20CV29287 from State of Oregon Josephine County. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7269419 issued.. Filed by TALK RADIO NETWORK, INC.. (Cauble, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foundation of Human Understanding v. Talk Radio Network, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundation of Human Understanding
Represented By: Conde T. Cox
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Kevin R. Schock
Represented By: Douglas R. Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Foundation of Human Understanding
Represented By: Conde T. Cox
Represented By: Stephen F. English
Represented By: Kevin R. Schock
Represented By: Douglas R. Pahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Talk Radio Network, Inc
Represented By: Christopher L. Cauble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?