USA v. $19,000 (US) currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $19,000 (US) currency
Claimant: Brendan M. Werner
Case Number: 1:2021cv00434
Filed: March 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 6 Claim to US Currency seized. Filed by Brendan M. Werner. Answer is due by 6/3/2021. (Howen, Ronald)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Claimant's Unopposed Motion #4 to Extend Date to File a Claim. Werner's claim is due no later than 5/14/2021. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
April 27, 2021 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a Claim. Filed by Brendan M. Werner, Claimant. (Howen, Ronald) Modified on 4/28/2021 to correct filing party (slm).
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 Warrant for Arrest of Property. Signed by Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
March 22, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (slm)
March 22, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Complaint, in rem, for Forfeiture (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by USA against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jed Rzegocki, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Harper, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $19,000 (US) currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $19,000 (US) currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Judith Rose Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Brendan M. Werner
Represented By: Ronald D. Howen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?