Marti et al v. U.S. Pro Moving and Logistics, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LINDA MARTI and FRED MARTI
Defendant: U.S. Pro Moving and Logistics, LLC, D United Logistic Moving & Storage, Inc., Jane Doe and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2021cv00471
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Ann L Aiken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49 U.S.C. ยง 14706
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED Scheduling Order by Judge Ann Aiken regarding Affidavit of Service #6 as to D United Logistic Moving & Storage, Inc. The clerk incorrectly set the Answer deadline. Answer is due by 4/21/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann Aiken. (rsm) Modified on 5/3/2021 (rsm) to correct Judge. Docket entry regenerated to the parties.
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AMENDED Scheduling Order by Judge Ann Aiken regarding Affidavit of Service #7 for U.S. Pro Moving and Logistics, LLC. The Clerk incorrectly set the Answer deadline. Answer is due by 4/28/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann Aiken. (rsm) Modified on 5/3/2021 (rsm) to correct Judge. Docket entry regenerated to the parties.
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Ann Aiken regarding Affidavit of Service #6 , Affidavit of Service #7 . Answer is due by 5/20/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann Aiken. (rsm) Modified on 5/3/2021 (rsm) to correct Judge. Docket entry regenerated to the parties.
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon U.S. Pro Moving and Logistics, LLC served on 4/7/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guyer, Thad)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #5 upon D United Logistic Moving & Storage, Inc. served on 3/31/2021 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Guyer, Thad)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to D United Logistic Moving & Storage, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to U.S. Pro Moving and Logistics, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rsm)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 7/28/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/27/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 8/27/2021. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rsm)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 3/29/2021 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ck)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8013452 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by FRED MARTI, LINDA MARTI against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Defendant US Pro, #3 Defendant D United). (Guyer, Thad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marti et al v. U.S. Pro Moving and Logistics, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA MARTI
Represented By: Thad M. Guyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED MARTI
Represented By: Thad M. Guyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Pro Moving and Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D United Logistic Moving & Storage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?