Estrada v. Avalon Health Care Hearthstone LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Tina Alonzo Estrada
Defendant: Staffers LLC, Avalon Health Care Hearthstone LLC, Avalon Health Care Royale Gardens LLC and AVALON HEALTH CARE, INC. d/b/a AVALON HEALTH CARE GROUP
Case Number: 1:2021cv00688
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2021 Filing 17 Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8123708. The request has been granted and the amount of $300.00 will be refunded to Michael K. Burke Related Doc #15 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (lp)
June 28, 2021 Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by All Defendants. Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Burke, Michael)
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Refund Request Due, 14 . Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Burke, Michael)
June 18, 2021 Filing 14 A duplicate payment in the amount of $300.00 was submitted by Tina Alonzo Estrada in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 6/28/2021. (nd)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #12 . Michael K. Burke appearing on behalf of Tina Alonzo Estrada. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael K Burke. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8123728. Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Addendum) (Burke, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael K Burke. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8123728 #12 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada against All Defendants. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Staffers LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
May 5, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Avalon Health Care Royale Gardens LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Avalon Health Care Hearthstone LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #5 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 9/2/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/2/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/4/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
May 5, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Sullivan, Dana)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8070703 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Tina Alonzo Estrada against Tina Alonzo Estrada. (Sullivan, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Avalon Health Care Hearthstone LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staffers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Health Care Hearthstone LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avalon Health Care Royale Gardens LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVALON HEALTH CARE, INC. d/b/a AVALON HEALTH CARE GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Alonzo Estrada
Represented By: Dana L. Sullivan
Represented By: Michael K Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?