Gene Pool Technologies, Inc. v. ANM, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.
Defendant: ANM, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01154
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 21 Amended Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand , Amended Counterclaim All Plaintiffs. Filed by ANM, Inc.. (Mackey, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Amended Answer is due by 9/21/2021. Responsive pleading or Motion due within 14 days of the filing of Amended Answer. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #17 . Michael C. Mackey on behalf of ANM, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
September 20, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Cole Mackey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8236001 #17 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
September 17, 2021 Filing 18 Joint Stipulation setting schedule to amend Answer by Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. Filed by Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Owens, Ryan)
September 17, 2021 Filing 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Michael Cole Mackey. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8236001. Filed by ANM, Inc.. (Mackey, Michael)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RECORD OF ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke: SETTING a telephonic Rule 16 Conference for November 15, 2021 at 10:00 AM. Conference call information will be provided in a separate entry. At the time of the Conference, parties should have their calendars available to discuss scheduling matters, including modification of the current case deadlines, joining additional parties and amending the pleadings, dispositive motions, and setting a trial date. The parties shall consult pursuant to FRCP 26(f) regarding a focused and proportional discovery plan prior to the Conference. A written report is not required. However, the parties should be prepared to briefly summarize the issues in the case and give the Court a realistic picture of what discovery needs to be completed. The ultimate goal of the discovery plan shall be "the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination" of the action. FRCP 1. If depositions are anticipated, the parties should confer prior to the Conference and have a firm date for the depositions scheduled prior to the conference. Parties shall confer prior to the Conference and consider whether the case could benefit from a streamlined approach, utilizing limited discovery and early dispositive motions, settlement conference, or an expedited trial date. Finally, if the parties intend to file written consents (these need to be filed separately on the docket by each party and not combined in a Joint Status Report) to a magistrate judge, it would be helpful to do so prior to the Rule 16 Conference, particularly if they want to secure a firm trial date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by ANM, Inc.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 Answer to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Counterclaim Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. Filed by ANM, Inc.. (DeCristo, Joshua)
August 12, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #11 Affidavit of Service. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The document was missing a case caption cover page. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Affidavit of Service #11 .ANM, Inc. Answer is due by 8/31/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 12, 2021 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service upon ANM, Inc. served on 8/10/2021 Filed by Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. (Owens, Ryan) (Main Document 11 replaced on 8/12/2021) (cw).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #8 . Ryan R. Owens appearing on behalf of Gene Pool Technologies, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 Patent Report:(Amended) This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent. (jkm)
August 10, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan Owens. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8186647 #8 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Ryan Owens. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8186647. Filed by Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. (Owens, Ryan)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to ANM, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Patent Report: This report is submitted pursuant to 35 U.S.C. section 290, which requires the clerks of the courts of the United States, within one month after the filing of an action under this title shall give notice thereof in writing to the Commissioner, setting forth so far as known the names and addresses of the parties, name of the inventor, and the designating number of the patent upon which the action has been brought. If any other patent is subsequently included in the action he shall give like notice thereof. Within one month after the decision is rendered or a judgment issued the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director. The Director shall, on receipt of such notices, enter the same in the file of such patent.. (jkm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #4 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 12/7/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/6/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/7/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/6/2022. Pretrial Order is due by 1/6/2022. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. (McGovern, Tracy)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. (McGovern, Tracy)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8184146 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 9,144,751--9/29/2015--Gene Pool Technologies, Inc., 9,145,532--9/29/2015--Gene Pool Technologies, Inc., 9,587,203--3/7/2017--Gene Pool Technologies, Inc., 9,604,155--3/28/2017--Gene Pool Technologies, Inc., 9,757,664--9/12/2017--Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.. Filed by Gene Pool Technologies, Inc. against ANM, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet). (McGovern, Tracy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gene Pool Technologies, Inc. v. ANM, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Pool Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy M. McGovern
Represented By: Ryan Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANM, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Cole Mackey
Represented By: Blake Marvis
Represented By: Joshua S. DeCristo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?