Esposito et al v. Adabala et al
Plaintiff: Linda Esposito and John Esposito
Defendant: Dikshith Ram Adabala, Moe Doe, Larry Doe, Curly Doe and Three Stooges Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01578
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2021 Filing 24 MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held. Discovery is to be completed by 6/30/2022. Dispositive Motions are due by 7/29/2022. Christopher L. Musmanno, I present as counsel for plaintiffs. Heather Beasley present as counsel for defendants. Judge Michael J. McShane presiding. (cp)
November 4, 2021 Filing 23 Answer to #3 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Dikshith Ram Adabala. (Beasley, Heather)
November 4, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Attorney Substitution: Heather C. Beasley is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Gregg Andrew Ilardi . Filed by Dikshith Ram Adabala. (Beasley, Heather)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #20 . Christopher L. Musmanno on behalf of Plaintiffs, Linda Esposito and John Esposito. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
November 2, 2021 Filing 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Christopher L Musmanno, I. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8291672. Filed by John Esposito, Linda Esposito. (Musmanno, Christopher)
November 2, 2021 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney Christopher L Musmanno, I. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8291672 #20 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (jkm)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael J. McShane: Rule 16 Conference is set for 11/15/2021 at 10:00AM in Eugene by telephone before Judge Michael J. McShane. (Copy mailed to all defense counsel) Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (cp)
October 29, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. (eo)
October 29, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE TO NON-ADMITTED COUNSEL: This case has been transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon from the District of New Jersey. Our records indicate that you are not admitted to practice in the District of Oregon. Admissions information is governed by #LR 83, and information about the admissions process is available on the #admissions page of the Court website. Related Document Case Transferred In - District Transfer #16 . (eo)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:21-cv-09197. Electronic file received.
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT ORDER TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1406(a);that the within litigation shall be transferred from the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon -Medford Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); that default entered as to Defendant, Dikshith Ram Adabala, be and hereby is vacated;etc.. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 10/21/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the within litigation shall be transferred from the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon -Medford Division, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); that default entered as to Defendant, Dikshith Ram Adabala, be and hereby is vacated;etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 10/21/2021. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
October 21, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG ANDREW ILARDI on behalf of DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 12 Proposed Order Consent to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) by All Plaintiffs re #11 Stipulation. (MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE.JOINT by All Plaintiffs. (MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGG ANDREW ILARDI on behalf of DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA (ILARDI, GREGG) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Stipulation to Transfer Venue, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (ECF No. 8). However, the Stipulation has not been signed by Defendant Dikshith Ram Adabala who has not entered an appearance in this case and against whom default has been entered (ECF No. 7). Further, any proposed Stipulation requires Court approval. As such, on or before 9/21/21, the parties are directed to submit a Joint Stipulation and proposed Order to Transfer Venue, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), stating the basis for same and signed by both Plaintiffs and Defendant Adabala. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 9/8/21. (jbb) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION To Transfer Venue by All Plaintiffs. (MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Default by All Plaintiffs against Dikshith Ram Adabala. (MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
July 27, 2021 [VACATED] Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (ld, ). [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals for all further proceedings. Judge John Michael Vazquez no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/30/2021. (ams, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
May 24, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LINDA ESPOSITO, JOHN ESPOSITO. DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA served on 5/4/2021, answer due 5/25/2021. (MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA, MOE DOE, LARRY DOE, CURLY DOE and/or THREE STOOGES CORPORATION filed by LINDA ESPOSITO, JOHN ESPOSITO.(MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 4/14/2021 (dam). [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by LINDA ESPOSITO, JOHN ESPOSITO as to DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA. (MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DIKSHITH RAM ADABALA, CURLY DOE, LARRY DOE, MOE DOE, THREE STOOGES CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12369228) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LINDA ESPOSITO, JOHN ESPOSITO.(MUSMANNO, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
April 14, 2021 Case assigned to Judge John Michael Vazquez and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]
April 14, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jr) [Transferred from New Jersey on 10/29/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esposito et al v. Adabala et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Esposito
Represented By: Christopher L Musmanno, I
Represented By: Damian Idiart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Esposito
Represented By: Christopher L Musmanno, I
Represented By: Damian Idiart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dikshith Ram Adabala
Represented By: Gregg Andrew Ilardi
Represented By: Heather C. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curly Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Three Stooges Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?