Buchanan v. Water Resources Commission et al
Petitioner: Bob Buchanan
Respondent: Water Resources Commission and Water Resources Department
Case Number: 1:2023cv00923
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order of Dismissal based on Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #34 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case No. 1:23-cv-00925-CL. Filed by Bob Buchanan.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case No. 1:23-cv-00923-CL. Filed by Bob Buchanan.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Water Resources Department, Water Resources Commission.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Joh, YoungWoo)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Bob Buchanan.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Opinion and Order. For the reasons set forth in this Opinion and Order, the OWRD's July 2023 Orders Denying Stays are AFFIRMED. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 08/09/2023 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (rsm)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing Held. Matters are taken under advisement. Matthew Martin and Ryan Harris present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Alexander Jones; Sara Van Loh and YoungWoo Joh present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Kellie Humiston. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL. (rsm)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (rsm)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Declaration of Ivan Gall In Support of Response to Petitioners' Brief Challenging Respondent OWRD's Orders Denying Stays. Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Related document(s): Response to Motion, (24 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 25 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Declaration of Sara Van Loh In Support of Response to Petitioners' Brief Challenging Respondent OWRD's Orders Denying Stays. Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Related document(s): Response to Motion, (24 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 25 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Response to Petitioners' Brief Challenging Order Denying Stays. Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Declaration of Matthew Martin . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Brief, (23 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 17 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 22 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 17 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 18 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 18 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Brief . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Hearing, (15 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 11 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 10 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 10 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 16 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 11 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL).)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held. Parties stipulate to the following briefing schedule: Petitioners' opening brief is due by 07/21/2023. Respondents' brief is due by 07/26/2023. Reply brief is waived. Parties stipulate that the issues for briefing and oral argument are limited to OWRD's denials of the stays of Respondents' Final Orders. A telephonic Hearing is set for 7/28/2023 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Matthew Martin present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sara D. Van Loh and Youngwoo Joh present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Hearing was not recorded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Attorney Substitution: Ryan D. Harris is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney T. Beau Ellis . Filed by on behalf of Grant Knoll, Bob Buchanan, Jessica Hartman, Ryan Hartman, Glenda Buchanan Stilwell.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Harris, Ryan)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held. A further telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/19/2023 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Matthew Martin present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sara D. Van Loh and Youngwoo Joh present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Hearing was not recorded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Scheduling Order regarding Motion for Hearing (15). A telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/17/2023 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED Scheduling Order regarding Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petitions for Judicial Review ) The clerk entered the incorrected Answer due date in the previous entry. Answer is due by 8/18/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:23-cv-00923-CL in case 1:23-cv-00925-CL in case 1:23-cv-00927-CL in case 1:23-cv-00928-CL in case 1:23-cv-00929-CL in case 1:23-cv-00930-CL. Answer is due by 7/18/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Motion for Hearing . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Grant Knoll, Bob Buchanan, Jessica Hartman, Ryan Hartman, Glenda Buchanan Stilwell.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petitions for Judicial Review. Filed by Water Resources Department, Water Resources Commission.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Motion to Consolidate (12) in case 1:23-cv-00923-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (13) in case 1:23-cv-00925-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (6) in case 1:23-cv-00927-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (7) in case 1:23-cv-00929-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (6) in case 1:23-cv-00930-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (7) in case 1:23-cv-00928-CL. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (rsm)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate . Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Jones, Alexander)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Water Resources Commission served on 6/30/2023; Water Resources Department served on 6/30/2023 Filed by Bob Buchanan. (Martin, Matthew)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer is due by 7/14/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Water Resources Department. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Water Resources Commission. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Proposed Summons Filed by Bob Buchanan. (Martin, Matthew)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons Filed by Bob Buchanan. (Martin, Matthew)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Judicial Review. Filed by Water Resources Department, Water Resources Commission. (Joh, YoungWoo)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Related Cases Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Joh, YoungWoo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #2 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 10/24/2023. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/24/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/24/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/24/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 11/24/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (jkm)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Notice of Removal (Payment received: AORDC-8992461, $402.00). Filed by Oregon Water Resources Department, Oregon Water Resources Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet 3). (Joh, YoungWoo) Modified on 6/27/2023 (jkm). To add payment information. NEF-Regenerated.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buchanan v. Water Resources Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bob Buchanan
Represented By: T. Beau Ellis
Represented By: Matthew Martin
Represented By: Ryan D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Water Resources Commission
Represented By: Alexander Charles Jones
Represented By: Sara D. Van Loh
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Water Resources Department
Represented By: Alexander Charles Jones
Represented By: Sara D. Van Loh
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?