Hartman et al v. Water Resources Department et al
Petitioner: Ryan Hartman and Jessica Hartman
Respondent: Water Resources Commission and Water Resources Department
Case Number: 1:2023cv00927
Filed: June 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Referring Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Scheduling Order. Answer is due by 9/1/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (rsm)
August 18, 2023 Filing 33 Amended Complaint . Filed by Ryan Hartman, Jessica Hartman against Water Resources Department (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - LR 15-1(b) Redline). (Martin, Matthew)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (29) in case 1:23-cv-00927-CL; Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (28) in case 1:23-cv-00929-CL; Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (29) in case 1:23-cv-00930-CL; Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (28) in case 1:23-cv-00928-CL. The Court extends the deadline for the responses from 08/18/2023 to 14 days after Petitioners file their amended petitions, inaccordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
August 15, 2023 Filing 31 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case No. 1:23-cv-00925-CL. Filed by Bob Buchanan.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
August 15, 2023 Filing 30 Amended Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case No. 1:23-cv-00923-CL. Filed by Bob Buchanan.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
August 15, 2023 Filing 29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Water Resources Department, Water Resources Commission.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Joh, YoungWoo)
August 14, 2023 Filing 28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal . Filed by Bob Buchanan.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Opinion and Order. For the reasons set forth in this Opinion and Order, the OWRD's July 2023 Orders Denying Stays are AFFIRMED. Please access entire text by document number hyperlink. Signed on 08/09/2023 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (rsm)
July 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing Held. Matters are taken under advisement. Matthew Martin and Ryan Harris present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Alexander Jones; Sara Van Loh and YoungWoo Joh present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Kellie Humiston. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL. (rsm)
July 28, 2023 Filing 25 Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (rsm)
July 27, 2023 Filing 24 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
July 27, 2023 Filing 23 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
July 26, 2023 Filing 22 Declaration of Ivan Gall In Support of Response to Petitioners' Brief Challenging Respondent OWRD's Orders Denying Stays. Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Related document(s): Response to Motion, (24 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 25 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 26, 2023 Filing 21 Declaration of Sara Van Loh In Support of Response to Petitioners' Brief Challenging Respondent OWRD's Orders Denying Stays. Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Related document(s): Response to Motion, (24 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 20 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 19 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 25 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 26, 2023 Filing 20 Response to Petitioners' Brief Challenging Order Denying Stays. Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 21, 2023 Filing 19 Declaration of Matthew Martin . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Brief, (23 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 17 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 22 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 17 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 18 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 18 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL).) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
July 21, 2023 Filing 18 Brief . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Hearing, (15 in 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 11 in 1:23-cv-00930-CL, 10 in 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 10 in 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 16 in 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 11 in 1:23-cv-00927-CL).)Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held. Parties stipulate to the following briefing schedule: Petitioners' opening brief is due by 07/21/2023. Respondents' brief is due by 07/26/2023. Reply brief is waived. Parties stipulate that the issues for briefing and oral argument are limited to OWRD's denials of the stays of Respondents' Final Orders. A telephonic Hearing is set for 7/28/2023 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Matthew Martin present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sara D. Van Loh and Youngwoo Joh present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Hearing was not recorded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 18, 2023 Filing 16 Notice of Attorney Substitution: Ryan D. Harris is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney T. Beau Ellis . Filed by on behalf of Grant Knoll, Bob Buchanan, Jessica Hartman, Ryan Hartman, Glenda Buchanan Stilwell.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Harris, Ryan)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephonic Status Conference held. A further telephonic Status Conference is set for 7/19/2023 at 02:00PM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Matthew Martin present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Sara D. Van Loh and Youngwoo Joh present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Hearing was not recorded. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Scheduling Order regarding Motion for Hearing (15). A telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 7/17/2023 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Teleconference information to be provided in a separate entry. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED Scheduling Order regarding Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petitions for Judicial Review ) The clerk entered the incorrected Answer due date in the previous entry. Answer is due by 8/18/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:23-cv-00923-CL in case 1:23-cv-00925-CL in case 1:23-cv-00927-CL in case 1:23-cv-00928-CL in case 1:23-cv-00929-CL in case 1:23-cv-00930-CL. Answer is due by 7/18/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 14, 2023 Filing 11 Motion for Hearing . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Grant Knoll, Bob Buchanan, Jessica Hartman, Ryan Hartman, Glenda Buchanan Stilwell.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Martin, Matthew)
July 13, 2023 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petitions for Judicial Review. Filed by Water Resources Department, Water Resources Commission.Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (Van Loh, Sara)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #5 . Answer is due by 7/14/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion to Consolidate (12) in case 1:23-cv-00923-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (13) in case 1:23-cv-00925-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (6) in case 1:23-cv-00927-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (7) in case 1:23-cv-00929-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (6) in case 1:23-cv-00930-CL; Granting Motion to Consolidate (7) in case 1:23-cv-00928-CL. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. Associated Cases: 1:23-cv-00923-CL, 1:23-cv-00925-CL, 1:23-cv-00927-CL, 1:23-cv-00928-CL, 1:23-cv-00929-CL, 1:23-cv-00930-CL (rsm)
July 6, 2023 Filing 7 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael J. McShane to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (eo)
July 3, 2023 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion to Consolidate . Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Jones, Alexander)
June 29, 2023 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Judicial Review. Filed by Water Resources Department, Water Resources Commission. (Joh, YoungWoo)
June 28, 2023 Filing 4 Notice of Related Cases Filed by Water Resources Commission, Water Resources Department. (Joh, YoungWoo)
June 26, 2023 Filing 3 Amended Complaint Amended Notice of Removal. Filed by Water Resources Department, Water Resources Commission against Jessica Hartman, Ryan Hartman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet). (Joh, YoungWoo)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael J. McShane and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/24/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/24/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 11/24/2023. Ordered by Judge Michael J. McShane. (jkm)
June 26, 2023 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 23cv18884 from Klamath County. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8992752 issued.. Filed by Oregon Water Resources Department, Oregon Water Resources Commission (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet). (Joh, YoungWoo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman et al v. Water Resources Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ryan Hartman
Represented By: Matthew Martin
Represented By: T. Beau Ellis
Represented By: Ryan D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jessica Hartman
Represented By: Matthew Martin
Represented By: T. Beau Ellis
Represented By: Ryan D. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Water Resources Commission
Represented By: Alexander Charles Jones
Represented By: Sara D. Van Loh
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Water Resources Department
Represented By: Alexander Charles Jones
Represented By: Sara D. Van Loh
Represented By: YoungWoo Joh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?