Christensen v. Curry County et al
Plaintiff: Richard Christensen
Defendant: Curry County, Brad Alcorn, Chris Paasch, David Barnes, John Ward and Michael Fitzgerald
Case Number: 1:2024cv00159
Filed: January 24, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Mark D Clarke
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Scheduling Order. Answers are due by 4/8/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (rsm)
February 13, 2024 Filing 17 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Chris Paasch waiver sent on 2/6/2024. Filed by Richard Christensen. (Sykes, Diane)
February 13, 2024 Filing 16 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Brad Alcorn waiver sent on 2/6/2024. Filed by Richard Christensen. (Sykes, Diane)
February 13, 2024 Filing 15 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Michael Fitzgerald waiver sent on 2/6/2024. Filed by Richard Christensen. (Sykes, Diane)
February 13, 2024 Filing 14 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by John Ward waiver sent on 2/6/2024. Filed by Richard Christensen. (Sykes, Diane)
February 13, 2024 Filing 13 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by David Barnes waiver sent on 2/6/2024. Filed by Richard Christensen. (Sykes, Diane)
February 13, 2024 Filing 12 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Curry County waiver sent on 2/6/2024. Filed by Richard Christensen. (Sykes, Diane)
February 7, 2024 Filing 11 Summons Issued Electronically as to Curry County. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (hm)
February 6, 2024 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Fitzgerald. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
February 6, 2024 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to John Ward. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
February 6, 2024 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to David Barnes. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
February 6, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Chris Paasch. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
February 6, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Brad Alcorn. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jkm)
February 1, 2024 Filing 5 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding Return of Service Unexecuted as to All Defendants, Amended Proposed Summons #4 . A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect event (Summons/Service Return) was used for the entry. The following corrections were made to the record: The entry and docket text have been corrected. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (jk)
January 25, 2024 Filing 4 Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Amended Summons, #2 Proposed Summons Amended Summons, #3 Proposed Summons Amended Summons, #4 Proposed Summons Amended Summons, #5 Proposed Summons Amended Summons) Filed by Richard Christensen. (Sykes, Diane) Modified as per ECF No. 5 on 2/1/2024 (jk).
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Scheduling Order regarding Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, #2 . Consent to Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, if any, is to be filed by 5/23/2024. Dispositive Motions are due by 6/24/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/23/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (hm)
January 24, 2024 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9247910 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Richard Christensen against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons). (Sykes, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. Curry County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Christensen
Represented By: Diane Schwartz Sykes
Represented By: Sean J. Riddell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curry County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Alcorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Paasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?