Swift Financial, LLC v. Alabar Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Swift Financial, LLC
Defendant: Alabar Construction, Inc. and John A. Fenton
Case Number: 2:2018cv02009
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of James P. Laurick . Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for default #6 .) (Laurick, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Form of Order Submitted - General Judgment. Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Laurick, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of James P. Laurick re Non-Military Service. Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment #8 , Motion for default #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Laurick, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 Bill of Costs . Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Laurick, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of James P. Laurick . Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment #8 , Motion for default #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Laurick, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Default Judgment . Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Laurick, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Form of Order Submitted - Order of Default. Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Laurick, James)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Laurick, James)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Alabar Construction, Inc. served on 11/29/2018; John A. Fenton served on 11/29/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Laurick, James)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Alabar Construction, Inc., John A. Fenton. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (joha)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 Declaration of James P. Laurick . Filed by Swift Financial, LLC. (Related document(s): Petition, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Laurick, James)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 Petition Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5642075. Filed by Swift Financial, LLC against Alabar Construction, Inc., John A. Fenton (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Alabar, #3 Proposed Summons Fenton). (Laurick, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swift Financial, LLC v. Alabar Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift Financial, LLC
Represented By: James P. Laurick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabar Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Fenton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?