Halladay v. McGraw
Petitioner: Jeffrey David Halladay
Respondent: Richard McGraw
Case Number: 2:2018cv02067
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Malcolm F Marsh
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 8 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
December 20, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Richard McGraw. (Kubernick, Samuel)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Richard McGraw. Filed by Richard McGraw. (Larsen, Lynn)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 2/19/2019. Signed on 12/18/2018 by Judge Malcolm F. Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha) (Copy of Scheduling Order Mailed to Petitioner.)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg)
November 30, 2018 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 81051 issued. (jn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Malcolm F. Marsh. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Memorandum in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 . Filed by Jeffrey David Halladay. (joha)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 81051 issued. Filed by Jeffrey David Halladay against Richard McGraw. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halladay v. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard McGraw
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeffrey David Halladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?