Smith v. McGraw

Petitioner: Rian T. Smith
Respondent: Richard McGraw
Case Number: 2:2018cv02068
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 12 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice #4 sent to Rian T. Smith returned as undeliverable. (dsg)
December 17, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney James M. Aaron is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Nicholas M. Kallstrom Filed by Richard McGraw. (Aaron, James)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Nick M. Kallstrom is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Richard McGraw. (Kallstrom, Nicholas)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THE CRIMINAL JUSTICE ACT, 18 U.S.C. 3006A: IT IS ORDERED that CJA Panel attorney Michelle A. Ryan is appointed pursuant to the provisions of the Criminal Justice Act, 18 U.S.C. 3006A, as substitute counsel, relieving Federal Public Defender Lisa Hay for Rian T. Smith, effective December 5, 2018. Signed on 12/6/2018 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Richard McGraw. Filed by Richard McGraw. (Larsen, Lynn)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Rian T. Smith regarding Order #5 . Clerk's Notice of Interoffice Mailing to FPD regarding Petition #1 and Order #5 . (joha)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 2/4/2019. Signed on 12/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (joha)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender, 101 S.W. Main, Suite 1700, Portland, Oregon 97204, is appointed to represent petitioner in this proceeding. See 18 U.S.C. 3006A(a)(2)(B). The Clerk is directed to send the Federal Public Defender a copy of the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed on 12/4/2018 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha)
November 30, 2018 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 81052 issued. (jn)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha) (Copy Mailed to Petitioner.)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Affidavit of Rian T. Smith in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel #2 . Filed by Rian T. Smith. (joha)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Rian T. Smith. (joha)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 81052 issued. Filed by Rian T. Smith against Richard McGraw. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richard McGraw
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Nicholas M. Kallstrom
Represented By: James M. Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rian T. Smith
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Represented By: Michelle A. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?