Martin et al v. Hermiston School District 8R et al

Plaintiff: Dawna Martin and Todd Martin
Defendant: David Faaeteete, Larry Usher, Dan Emery, Hermiston School District 8R and Matthew Bruck
Case Number: 2:2018cv02088
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: Oregon District Court
0 Judge: Marco A Hernandez
1 Judge: Patricia Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order 6 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. A Rule 16 Telephone Conference is set for 2/14/2019 at 11:30AM before Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Counsel are required to confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. The Court directs the parties to submit a jointly proposed schedule to the courtroom deputy by email no later than Noon the day before the hearing (keeping in mind that Judge Hernandez expects civil cases to be tried within 18 months of the date of filing). The parties shall call into the Court's conference line (the phone number provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (jp)
January 15, 2019 5 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Dawna Martin(an individual), Dawna Martin(Guardian Ad Litem for Connor Martin, a minor), Todd Martin. (Dolan, Martin)
December 12, 2018 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Dan Emery, Hermiston School District 8R, Larry Usher, Matthew Bruck, David Faaeteete. (Vickers, Karen)
December 10, 2018 3 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 4/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/6/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/6/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia Sullivan. (jtj)
December 5, 2018 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV40429 from Umatilla County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5658262 issued.. Filed by Dan Emery, Hermiston School District 8R, Larry Usher, Matthew Bruck, David Faaeteete (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet). (Vickers, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin et al v. Hermiston School District 8R et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawna Martin
Represented By: Martin C. Dolan
Represented By: Patricia M. Pascone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Martin
Represented By: Martin C. Dolan
Represented By: Patricia M. Pascone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Faaeteete
Represented By: Blake H. Fry
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Usher
Represented By: Blake H. Fry
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Emery
Represented By: Blake H. Fry
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hermiston School District 8R
Represented By: Blake H. Fry
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bruck
Represented By: Blake H. Fry
Represented By: Karen M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?