Cufaude v. Cain

Petitioner: Andrew Benton Cufaude
Respondent: Brad Cain
Case Number: 2:2019cv00070
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael J McShane
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney C. Renee Manes is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lisa Hay Filed by Andrew Benton Cufaude. (Manes, C.)
February 8, 2019 Filing 8 Request for Withdrawal of Funds and Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Andrew Benton Cufaude. Filed by Andrew Benton Cufaude. (joha)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Brad Cain. (Boyd, Kristen)
January 31, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Brad Cain. Filed by Brad Cain. (Larsen, Lynn)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent; Granting Application to Proceed IFP #3 and Motion for Appointment of Counsel #4 . Answer is due by 4/1/2019. Signed on 1/31/19 by Judge Michael J. McShane. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance/Acknowledgement Form, #2 2254 Petition)**48 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Andrew Cufaude, Prisoner ID: 14511972) (kf)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Andrew Benton Cufaude.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Andrew Cufaude, Prisoner ID: 14511972) (dsg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Andrew Benton Cufaude.**PRINT NEF ONLY**(Andrew Cufaude, Prisoner ID: 14511972) (dsg)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael J. McShane. ***PRINT ALL, 3 Pages*** (Andrew Benton Cufaude, 14511972) (dsg) Modified on 1/16/2019 (dsg).
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Andrew Benton Cufaude against Brad Cain. ***PRINT NEF ONLY*** (Andrew Benton Cufaude, 14511972) (dsg) Modified on 1/16/2019 (dsg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cufaude v. Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Andrew Benton Cufaude
Represented By: C. Renee Manes
Represented By: Lisa Hay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brad Cain
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?