Bauer v Washburn

Petitioner: Kirk Michael Bauer
Respondent: Sue Washburn
Case Number: 2:2019cv00264
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 Pro se Supplemental Brief for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filed by Kirk Michael Bauer. (dsg)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 Pro se Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Filed by Kirk Michael Bauer. (dsg)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Withdraw or Substitute an Attorney . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Kirk Michael Bauer. (Frank, Jay)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) . Filed by Kirk Michael Bauer against Sue Washburn. (Frank, Jay)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Samuel A. Kubernick is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Sue Washburn. (Kubernick, Samuel)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Sue Washburn. Filed by Sue Washburn. (Larsen, Lynn)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 4/29/2019. Signed on 2/26/19 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment, #2 Petition) (dsg)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (kf)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) Filing Fee in amount of $5 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5746549. Filed by kirk michael bauer against Sue Washburn. (Frank, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauer v Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kirk Michael Bauer
Represented By: Jay W. Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sue Washburn
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Samuel A. Kubernick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?